skip to content

Amirjani, Nasim

CPSO#: 85418

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 May 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Iran Univ.of Med Sciences & Hlth Service, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 27 Jul 2006 to 23 Aug 2006
EL - Neurology

Western University, 20 Sep 2007 to 12 Dec 2007
EL - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 28 May 2008
EL - Paediatric Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 May 2008