skip to content

Amin, Sheikh Noor Ul

CPSO#: 93950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 Wincott Dr
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Phone: (416) 249-0842 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

5230 Dundas St West
Etobicoke ON  M9B1A8
Canada
Phone: 416-234-8668
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

107-6750 Winston Churchill Blvd
Mississauga ON  L5N 4V4
Canada
Phone: 905-785-9952
Fax: 905-785-8328
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S.N. Amin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 93950 )

Business Address:
250 Wincott Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9R 2R5
Phone Number: (416) 249-0842

Business Address:
5230 Dundas Street West
Etobicoke ON  M9B 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 234-8668

Business Address:
Suite 107
6750 Winston Churchill Boulevard
Mississauga ON  L5N 4V4

Business Address:
Suite 509
330 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5H 2S8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:28 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHEIKH NOOR UL AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010