skip to content

Amin, Shaista

CPSO#: 87560

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Dow Medical College, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winston Churchill Medical Centre
Suite 1A
6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2W7
Phone: (905) 8125404
Fax: (905) 812-7123 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

373 Steeles Avenue West
Brampton ON  L6Y5H9
Canada
Phone: 905 452 8881
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

25 Great Lakes drive
Brampton ON  L6R 0J8
Canada
Phone: 905 494 0302
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shaista Amin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amin ( CPSO# 87560 )

Business Address:
Unit 1A
6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Circle
Mississauga ON  L5N 2W7
Phone Number: (905) 812-5404

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAISTA AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 23 Dec 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009