skip to content

Amin, Qamar Ul

CPSO#: 91629

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Windsor University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Suite C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Ext. 58097
Fax: (905) 494-6571
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Qamar Amin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Amin ( CPSO# 91629 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Emergency Medicine
Suite C753
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5

Business Address:
William Osler Health Centre
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 20 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. QAMAR UL AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 21 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014