Amin, Muhammad (CPSO#: 96373)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Wonderland Medicentre
1375 Beaverbrook Ave
London ON  N6H 0J1
Phone: (519) 471-6686
Fax: (519) 471-2801
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Amin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Amin ( CPSO# 96373 )

Business Address:
Wonderland Medicentre
1375 Beaverbrook Avenue
London ON  N6H 0J1
Phone Number: (519) 471-6686

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD AMIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013