skip to content

Amid, Ali

CPSO#: 95071

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont.
Division of Pediatric Hematology
and Oncology
401 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737 7600 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 11 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI AMID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 23 May 2011 to 03 Jun 2011
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2014