skip to content

Ames, Christina Marie

CPSO#: 92194

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 19 Oct 2009 to 15 Nov 2009
EL - Emergency Medicine

University of Ottawa, 16 Nov 2009 to 13 Dec 2009
EL - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Jul 2013