skip to content

Amer, Tehmina

CPSO#: 86839

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ancaster Medical Centre
103-1144 Wilson St. West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone: (905) 304-8017
Fax: 905-304-8004 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Amer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Amer ( CPSO# 86839 )

Business Address:
103 - 1144 Wilson Street West
Ancaster ON  L9G 3K9
Phone Number: (905) 304-8001

Business Address:
Brantford General
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:18 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TEHMINA AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 27 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2014