skip to content

Amer, Amal Abdel-Moneim Morssi Mohamed

CPSO#: 90884

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quality Medical Clinic
1375 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2C 3G1
Phone: (613) 627-3901
Fax: (613) 627-3902 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Box 819
5541 Ann Street First Floor
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Canada
Phone: (613) 692-5433
Fax: 613-692-5435
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Canada
Phone: 613-482-0118
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amal Amer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amer ( CPSO# 90884 )

Business Address:
First Floor
5541 Ann Street
P O Box 819
Manotick ON  K4M 1A7
Phone Number: (613) 692-5433

Business Address:
2948 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:07 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMAL ABDEL-MONEIM MORSSI MOHAMED AMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 21 Sep 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2011