skip to content

Ambreen, Shazia

CPSO#: 85788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Feb 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Feb 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
PO Box 4000
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone: (705) 435-6281 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6563
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shazia Ambreen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ambreen ( CPSO# 85788 )

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
Stevenson Memorial Hospital
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAZIA AMBREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMBREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 02 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 04 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Feb 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2007