skip to content

Ambis, Robert Joseph Stanley

CPSO#: 20902

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Apr 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Jul 1967

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Ambis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020

Medical Records Location

Address: 310-15 Mountain Ave. South Stoney Creek, Ontario L8G 2V6
Date Received: 22 Apr 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Apr 2020

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 4, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Robert Joseph Stanley Ambis to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 4, 2020:

The College investigated Dr. Ambis’s conduct in his family medicine practice. During the investigation, Dr. Ambis resigned his certificate of registration from the College, which he obtained in 1967. Dr. Ambis will not reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction. The College made no findings against Dr. Ambis and took no further action on its investigation.
Download Full Document (PDF)