skip to content

Amaral, Andre Carlos Kajdacsy-Balla

CPSO#: 90217

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:U ESTADUAL PAULISTA-BOTUCATU SAO PAOLO, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
Room B5 02
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 83666 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andre Amaral Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Amaral ( CPSO# 90217 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Critical Care Medicine
Room B5 02
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Critical Care Medicine Effective:14 Sep 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2009 to 25 Mar 2009
PEAP - CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Sep 2010
CF - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017 Active
             1.    Dr. Andre Carlos Kajdacsy-Balla Amaral may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Critical Care Medicine, University of Toronto, in which
                        Dr.  Amaral  holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires when Dr. Amaral no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.