skip to content

Amanullah, Shabbir

CPSO#: 97496

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 10 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:Mysore University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone: (519) 421-4223 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shabbir Amanullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Amanullah ( CPSO# 97496 )

Business Address:
Woodstock General Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India
Northwest Territories
Prince Edward Island

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:16 Apr 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 10 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 09 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Feb 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2015 Active
             Dr. Shabbir Amanullah may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.