skip to content

Amankwah, Kofi Sarpong

CPSO#: 23124

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 13 Aug 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 13 Aug 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Akan, English

Education:University of Alberta, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:11 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1970
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015