skip to content

Amaladoss, Antony Sebastian Jesudoss

CPSO#: 85894

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jan 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 Jan 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 6
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 3P9
Phone: (905) 333-4262
Fax: (905) 333-9262 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amaladoss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 2 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:29 Jan 2007 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jan 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jul 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 07 Aug 2009

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 07 Aug 2009 Active
             Dr.  Antony Sebastian Jesudoss Amaladoss may practise medicine independently in
            Psychiatry, only.