skip to content

Alzayer, Hussain Jamal A

CPSO#: 97491

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUSSAIN JAMAL A ALZAYER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALZAYER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 03 May 2012 to 20 Jun 2012
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 21 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2017