skip to content

Alzahrani, Saud Abdullah A

CPSO#: 97855

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 18 Jun 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 09 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 09 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018