skip to content

Alwohaiby, Abdullah Abdulaziz A

CPSO#: 92240

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 10 Dec 2009
PEAP - CF - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 11 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Trauma General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
CF - Trauma General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011