skip to content

Alwasaidi, Turki Abdulaziz Mansour

CPSO#: 90475

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013