skip to content

Alwahibi, Abdulrahman Saleh Abdulaziz

CPSO#: 96356

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 17 Oct 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 18 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013