skip to content

Alturkustani, Murad Abdulkareem M

CPSO#: 88671

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 Dec 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 11 May 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective:01 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 29 Jul 2008
PEAP - R - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 01 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Aug 2009 to 01 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Feb 2010 to 01 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2010 to 01 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2011 to 01 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2008
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 2010
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Dec 2014