skip to content

Altouri, Sultan Mohammed Hussain

CPSO#: 96644

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Khalid University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 77034 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Altouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Altouri ( CPSO# 96644 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Division of Hematology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 12 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SULTAN MOHAMMED HUSSAIN ALTOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTOURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Aug 2015
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2015