skip to content

Altmann, Karolina

CPSO#: 88093

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 16 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Czech, English, Slovak

Education:Univerzity P.J. Safarika, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 404
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone: (519) 204-5761
Fax: (519) 204-6817 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Altmann Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Altmann ( CPSO# 88093 )

Business Address:
Suite 404
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 204-5761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Mar 2008 to 23 May 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 May 2008 to 28 Feb 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Mar 2009 to 28 Feb 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Mar 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Dec 2017 Active
             Dr. Karolina Altmann may practise medicine independently in family medicine.