skip to content

Althenayan, Anas Abdullah T

CPSO#: 97449

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
emergency medicine department
St Thomas Elgin General Hospital
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone: 5196312020 Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:25 Sep 2019 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANAS ABDULLAH T ALTHENAYAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALTHENAYAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2012 to 28 Jun 2012
PEAP - R - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2019