skip to content

Altamirano-Diaz, Luis Antonio

CPSO#: 89138

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Oct 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Mayor de San Simon, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8237
Fax: (519) 685-8584 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
1995 Lens Street
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5577
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Luis Altamirano-Diaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Altamirano-Diaz ( CPSO# 89138 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Paediatrics
Room B5-122D
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:02 Aug 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 08 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Pediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 09 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Pediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Aug 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Luis Antonio Altamirano-Diaz may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Paediatrics,   University   of   Western   Ontario,  in  which  Dr.
                        Altamirano-Diaz  holds  an  academic appointment  at  the  rank  of
                        Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The   certificate  of  registration  automatically   expires   when   Dr.
                  Altamirano-Diaz   no  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause
                  1.