skip to content

Alsuhaibani, Omar Mohammed O

CPSO#: 89629

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 18 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 17 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Transfusion Medicine

University Of Toronto, 18 Oct 2008 to 17 Oct 2009
CF - Transfusion Medicine

University Of Toronto, 18 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
CF - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010