skip to content

Alshehri, Saleh Abdullah S

CPSO#: 97335

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Feb 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Feb 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Khalid University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2012 to 24 May 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 25 May 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2013