skip to content

Alshehhi, Maryam Hasan Abdulla Darwish

CPSO#: 88291

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Arabian Gulf University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 May 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 02 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Oct 2009 to 02 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 03 Oct 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2011 to 31 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 26 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 27 Aug 2013 to 10 Jan 2014
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Jan 2014