skip to content

Alsharm, Abdullah Ali Attia

CPSO#: 89093

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 19 Aug 2008
PEAP - Resident - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 20 Aug 2008 to 19 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 20 Aug 2009 to 19 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 20 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 19 Sep 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Aug 2011