skip to content

Alsharekh, Monther M A M H

CPSO#: 95023

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kuwait University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:07 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 24 May 2011 to 19 Jun 2011
EL - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Western University, 05 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Western University, 05 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015