skip to content

Alshammari, Nuha Salem

CPSO#: 96422

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Jul 2011
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 16 Jul 2011 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2013 to 23 Nov 2013
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 24 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016