skip to content

Alshahrani, Ali Mohamed G

CPSO#: 94844

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Asclepios Cardiology
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON  K4A 0N9
Phone: (613) 830-8388 Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI MOHAMED G ALSHAHRANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALSHAHRANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 28 Feb 2011 to 27 Mar 2011
EL - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 17 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 09 Nov 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Feb 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2014