skip to content

Alsayegh, Ammar Ali T M

CPSO#: 91273

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Jun 2009 to 28 Aug 2009
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2009 to 28 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2010 to 28 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2011 to 28 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 29 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014