skip to content

Alsarraf, Dhia Abdul Hussain

CPSO#: 23002

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 03 Feb 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Feb 1983

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Baghdad, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Specified Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1980
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Feb 1983
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.