skip to content

Alsahli, Mazen

CPSO#: 92612

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Mar 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 26 Mar 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
531 Davis Drive
Suite 309
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone: (905) 898-6100
Fax: (905) 898-6105 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Belton Blvd
Suite 206
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Canada
Phone: (289) 362-5255
Fax: (905) 378-3370
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mazen Alsahli Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Alsahli ( CPSO# 92612 )

Business Address:
Suite 309
531 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 6P5
Phone Number: (905) 898-6100

Business Address:
1 Belton Boulevard
Suite 206
St Catharines ON  L2T 3Y4
Phone Number: (289) 362-5255


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Connecticut
USA - Pennsylvania

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:26 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:26 Mar 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Mar 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Dec 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 13 Dec 2012 Active
 Dr.  Mazen Alsahli may practice medicine independently in internal medicine and
            endocrinology, only.