skip to content

Alsaggaf, Manal Ahmed A

CPSO#: 92148

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 12 Oct 2009 to 07 Dec 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Western University, 08 Dec 2009 to 07 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 08 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 15 Dec 2010 to 14 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 15 Dec 2011 to 04 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 05 Apr 2012 to 04 Apr 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2013 to 06 May 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 06 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 07 May 2015 to 01 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 02 Jun 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016