skip to content

Alqurashi, Waleed

CPSO#: 89672

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ont
Division of Paed Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3955
Fax: (613) 738-4885 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Brewer Way
Ottawa ON  K1S 5T1
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: AlQurashi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Alqurashi ( CPSO# 89672 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Division of Paed Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:10 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WALEED ALQURASHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALQURASHI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2010 to 03 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2013