skip to content

Alqarawi, Wael Abdulrahman A

CPSO#: 94861

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Dec 2020
EXPIRY DATE
18 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: University of Ottawa - Heart Institute 40 Ruskin St Ottawa, ON K1Y 4W7
Date Received: 09 Dec 2020


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2011 to 08 May 2011
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 May 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Dec 2020