skip to content

Aloudat, Sarah Ibrahim Mnazel

CPSO#: 91548

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Jordan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2400 Princess St
Apex Heart Centre
Kingston ON  K7M 3G4
Phone: 613-547-5450
Fax: 613-547-9177 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Aloudat Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aloudat ( CPSO# 91548 )

Business Address:
2400 Princess St
Kingston ON  K7M 3G4
Phone Number: 613-547-5450

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 3 Hemodialysis Unit
Nephrology Department
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH IBRAHIM MNAZEL ALOUDAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOUDAT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
AVP - Nephrology

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010