skip to content

Alomar, Soha Abdu Mahmoud

CPSO#: 86142

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 May 2007 to 06 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2007 to 06 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2009 to 06 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2010 to 06 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2011 to 06 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 07 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014