skip to content

Alolabi, Noor

CPSO#: 97625

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 560
2525 Old Bronte Rd.
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: 2893863636
Fax: 2893863536 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Canada
Phone: 905-845-2571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Milton Hospital
725 Bronte St S
Milton ON  L9T 9K1
Canada
Phone: 905-878-2383
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Georgetown Hospital
1 Princess Anne Dr.
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8
Canada
Phone: 905-873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Queensway Health Centre
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Canada
Phone: (416) 259-6671
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Rd.
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2
Canada
Phone: 905-632-3737
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Canada
Phone: (905) 813-2200
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alolabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Alolabi ( CPSO# 97625 )

Business Address:
Suite 560
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2

Business Address:
725 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 9K1

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B8

Business Address:
1245 Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7S 0A2

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Milton District Hos,pital Milton
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NOOR ALOLABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOLABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2018