skip to content

Alolabi, Bashar

CPSO#: 86901

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford Orthopaedic Institute
270 King George Road
Brantford ON  N3R 5L5
Phone: (519) 757-5858
Fax: (519) 757-1823 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. B. Alolabi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Alolabi ( CPSO# 86901 )

Business Address:
Athlete's Care
100 James Street South
Hamilton ON  L8P 2Z2

Business Address:
Brantford Orthopaedic Institute
270 King George Rd
Brantford ON  N3R 5L5
Phone Number: 519-757-5858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation - Oakville Trafalgar,Memorial Hospit Oakville
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BASHAR ALOLABI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALOLABI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 2013