skip to content

Alobaid, Abdullah Omar A

CPSO#: 86163

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jun 2007 to 03 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2007 to 03 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2008 to 03 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2009 to 03 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2010 to 03 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2011 to 03 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 04 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2014