skip to content

Alnhisi, Khaled Mohamed Abobakr

CPSO#: 94595

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grantham Medical Clinic
Unit B3
400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Phone: (905) 937-0000
Fax: (905) 937-0030 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

968 Albion Rd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1A7
Canada
Phone: 4166138596
Fax: 4165469065
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alnhisi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Alnhisi ( CPSO# 94595 )

Business Address:
Grantham Medical Clinic
400 Scott Street
St Catharines ON  L2M 3W4
Phone Number: (905) 937-0000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALED MOHAMED ABOBAKR ALNHISI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNHISI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2011