skip to content

Almutawa, Mohammad

CPSO#: 92476

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Science Centre
300 Prince Philip Dr
Department of Cardiology
St. John's NL  A1B 3V6
Phone: 7097265311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Kuwait
Newfoundland and Labrador
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ALMUTAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMUTAWA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Feb 2010 to 07 Mar 2010
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University Of Toronto, 08 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
EL - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 2017