Almutairi, Sultan Ahmad S (CPSO#: 99932)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 13 Mar 2013 to 09 Apr 2013
Elective Trainee - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2017