skip to content

Almubarak, Zaid Abdulrahman M

CPSO#: 124555

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Aug 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2025
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Postgraduate Education as of 03 Aug 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Fahd Hospital of The Universit
Alkhobar 34445
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAID ABDULRAHMAN M ALMUBARAK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. ALMUBARAK is enrolled at WESTERN UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. ALMUBARAK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. ALMUBARAK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. ALMUBARAK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. ALMUBARAK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. ALMUBARAK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2025.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 15 Feb 2021 to 01 Mar 2021
PEAP - EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 02 Mar 2021 to 31 Mar 2021
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2021 to 23 Sep 2021
PEAP - R - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Sep 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2022 to 20 Sep 2022
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 21 Sep 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2023 to 20 Sep 2023
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 21 Sep 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 01 Jul 2024 to 20 Sep 2024
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Western University, 21 Sep 2024 to 30 Jun 2025
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2021
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025