skip to content

Almotairi, Majed Ali H

CPSO#: 97174

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 12 Mar 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2013