skip to content

Almogbel, Osama Abdullah S

CPSO#: 92754

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
11Pmb - 131
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: 6479551917 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

8333 Weston Rd, Suite 401
Woodbridge ON  L4L 8E2
Canada
Phone: 905-264-0022
Fax: 905-264-0085
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Osama Almogbel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Almogbel ( CPSO# 92754 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Cardiology Department
11Pmb - 131
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (647) 955-1917


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OSAMA ABDULLAH S ALMOGBEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMOGBEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2012