skip to content

Almikhlafi, Mowaffaq Abdu

CPSO#: 99351

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOWAFFAQ ABDU ALMIKHLAFI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMIKHLAFI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 05 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012